TX HB4760 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Hutto Municipal Management District No. 1; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Hutto Municipal Management District No. 1; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HUTTO MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4760 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04760I.htm |