TX HB486 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the calculation of the rollback tax rate of a school district.
Title
Relating to the calculation of the rollback tax rate of a school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#659 (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#612 (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Amendment tabled RV#611 (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#612 (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Amendment tabled RV#611 (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-12 | House | Returned to committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Point of order sustained |
2017-04-12 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-04-11 | House | Postponed |
2017-04-11 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-04-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-04-11 | House | Postponed |
2017-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District