TX HB486 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the age of criminal responsibility and to certain substantive and procedural matters related to that age.
Title
Relating to the age of criminal responsibility and to certain substantive and procedural matters related to that age.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1273 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice