TX HB5186 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the state health benefit plan reimbursement review board and the reimbursement for health care services or supplies provided under certain state-funded health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the state health benefit plan reimbursement review board and the reimbursement for health care services or supplies provided under certain state-funded health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2502 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB2502 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB2502 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Open Meetings
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
SENATE, TEXAS
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN REIMBURSEMENT REVIEW BOARD
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Open Meetings
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
SENATE, TEXAS
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN REIMBURSEMENT REVIEW BOARD
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM