TX HB521 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain laws governing corporations to limited liability companies.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain laws governing corporations to limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Elkins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-04-19 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-04-14 | Postponed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-02-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-02-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2011-01-05 | Filed |