TX HB608 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to posttrial psychological counseling for jurors in a criminal trial or juvenile adjudication hearing involving graphic evidence or testimony.
Title
Relating to posttrial psychological counseling for jurors in a criminal trial or juvenile adjudication hearing involving graphic evidence or testimony.
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D] | Sen. Earl Wentworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-14 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-12 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-12 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-30 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-23 | Read first time | |
2009-04-22 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-21 | Record vote | |
2009-04-21 | Passed | |
2009-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-20 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-20 | Amended | |
2009-04-20 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-20 | Postponed | |
2009-04-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-11 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-11 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-02-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2009-01-14 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1066 (Same As) 2009-04-30 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Subjects
COUNSELING & THERAPY
Courts
Courts--Juries
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
Juvenile Boards & Officers
Courts
Courts--Juries
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
Juvenile Boards & Officers