TX HB630 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Promise Scholarship Program for certain students at participating two-year public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Promise Scholarship Program for certain students at participating two-year public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB998 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SCHOLARSHIPS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SCHOLARSHIPS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB630 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00630I.htm |