TX HB636 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creation of the Texas Health Insurance Connector.
Title
Relating to creation of the Texas Health Insurance Connector.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Insurance | |
2011-02-23 | Correction in referral | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-02-21 | Read first time | |
2011-01-13 | Filed |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HEALTH INSURANCE CONNECTOR, TEXAS
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
HEALTH INSURANCE CONNECTOR, TEXAS
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB636 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB00636I.htm |