TX HB645 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the information required to be included on a form for an application for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of property owned by a charitable organization.
Title
Relating to the information required to be included on a form for an application for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of property owned by a charitable organization.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Orr [R] | Sen. Dan Patrick [R] | Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-06 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-06 | Record vote | |
2011-04-06 | Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-05 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-22 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-02-21 | Read first time | |
2011-01-13 | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions