TX HB690 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to dedicating certain state revenue to the purpose of retiring state debt.
Title
Relating to dedicating certain state revenue to the purpose of retiring state debt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
DEBT
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
DEBT
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB690 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00690I.htm |