TX HB71 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-20 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Pending: Senate Transportation & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-20 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Pending: Senate Transportation & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the fee charged for the Texas Airport Directory.
Title
Relating to the fee charged for the Texas Airport Directory.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-01 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-01 | Record vote | |
2011-04-01 | Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-31 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-31 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-03-23 | Postponed | |
2011-03-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-02-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-02-25 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-02-25 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-02-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-02-15 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-02-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-02-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-14 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |