TX HB885 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.
Title
Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Gina Calanni [D] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] |
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Rep. Art Fierro [D] | Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Julie Johnson [D] |
Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] | Rep. James Talarico [D] | Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-29 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 753 |
2019-04-25 | House | Postponed 4/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-16 | House | Postponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB753 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Labor
Labor--Wages
MINIMUM WAGE
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Wages
MINIMUM WAGE
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS