TX HB920 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of all-terrain vehicles and recreational off-highway vehicles.
Title
Relating to the operation of all-terrain vehicles and recreational off-highway vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1412 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-13 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2017-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration