TX HB967 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers of the TexAmericas Center.
Title
Relating to the powers of the TexAmericas Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#755 (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amended RV#693 (Y: 119 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#755 (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amended RV#693 (Y: 119 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-04-20 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOWIE COUNTY
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Military & Veterans
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Military & Veterans
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous