TX HB980 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reimbursement and payment of claims by certain health benefit plan issuers for telemedicine medical services and telehealth services.
Title
Relating to the reimbursement and payment of claims by certain health benefit plan issuers for telemedicine medical services and telehealth services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB228 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Co-author authorized
HB515 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Insurance
HB522 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Insurance
HB515 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Insurance
HB522 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Insurance
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
TELEMEDICINE
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
TELEMEDICINE