TX HB983 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health insurance coverage for eligible survivors of certain public servants killed in the line of duty.
Title
Relating to health insurance coverage for eligible survivors of certain public servants killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-04-18 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-04-12 | Postponed | |
2011-04-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-01-28 | Filed |