TX HCR125 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Status: Introduced on March 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Summary
Urging the U.S. Congress to increase COPS grants for smaller communities and less populated counties in the South Texas High Intensity Drug Trafficking Area.
Title
Urging the U.S. Congress to increase COPS grants for smaller communities and less populated counties in the South Texas High Intensity Drug Trafficking Area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-15 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-15 | Adopted | |
2009-04-15 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-03 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-03 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-30 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | |
2009-03-20 | Filed |
Subjects
COMMUNITY ORIENTED POLICING SERVICES
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress