TX HCR130 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating former State Representative Ken Mercer on his retirement from USAA.
Title
Congratulating former State Representative Ken Mercer on his retirement from USAA.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Again read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-03-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SCR55 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Received by the Secretary of the Senate