TX HJR139 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homesteads of certain disabled first responders and their surviving spouses.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homesteads of certain disabled first responders and their surviving spouses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4367 (Enabled by) 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions