TX HJR67 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation a percentage of the assessed value of property owned by certain disabled veterans.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation a percentage of the assessed value of property owned by certain disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-14 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB683 (Enabled by) 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions