TX HR2294 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating Gold Star Mother's Day 2017.
Title
Commemorating Gold Star Mother's Day 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
GOLD STAR MOTHER'S DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates