TX SB11 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the prevention, investigation, prosecution, and punishment for certain gang-related and other criminal offenses and to the consequences and costs of engaging in certain activities of a criminal street gang or certain other criminal activity; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the prevention, investigation, prosecution, and punishment for certain gang-related and other criminal offenses and to the consequences and costs of engaging in certain activities of a criminal street gang or certain other criminal activity; providing penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Wayne Christian [R] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] |
Rep. Robert Miklos [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Sen. Dan Patrick [R] | Sen. Eliot Shapleigh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-24 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed | |
2009-03-05 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4310 (Same As) 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
GANGS
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
ORGANIZED CRIME
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
GANGS
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
ORGANIZED CRIME
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF