TX SB1105 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the resumption of employment by certain retirees within the Texas Municipal Retirement System.
Title
Relating to the resumption of employment by certain retirees within the Texas Municipal Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-18 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3902 |
2021-05-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-14 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3902 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call