TX SB1120 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to reports on racial profiling in connection with motor vehicle stops; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to reports on racial profiling in connection with motor vehicle stops; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-20 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-04 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Amended | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-24 | Filed | |
2009-02-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3563 (Same As) 2009-03-30 - Subcommittee members named
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STANDARDS & EDUCATION, COMMN. ON
PEACE OFFICERS
RACIAL PROFILING
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STANDARDS & EDUCATION, COMMN. ON
PEACE OFFICERS
RACIAL PROFILING