TX SB1159 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to hospital liens.
Title
Relating to hospital liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2929 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
HB2927 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
HB2927 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Subjects
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Hospitals
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Hospitals
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1159 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01159I.htm |