TX SB117 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to photograph and live lineup identification procedures in criminal cases.
Title
Relating to photograph and live lineup identification procedures in criminal cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time | |
2009-04-16 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Passed | |
2009-04-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-16 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-06 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3583 (Same As) 2009-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
BILL BLACKWOOD LAW ENFORCEMENT MANAGEMENT INSTITUTE OF TX
CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIONS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STANDARDS & EDUCATION, COMMN. ON
WITNESSES
CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIONS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STANDARDS & EDUCATION, COMMN. ON
WITNESSES