TX SB1178 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of certain shelter day-care facilities, child-care facilities, and individuals providing child-care services, and access to certain criminal history record information; providing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to the regulation of certain shelter day-care facilities, child-care facilities, and individuals providing child-care services, and access to certain criminal history record information; providing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Read | |
2011-05-27 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-10 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-10 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Human Services | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Filed | |
2011-03-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Day Care
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PERMITS
WOMEN'S SHELTERS
City Government--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Day Care
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PERMITS
WOMEN'S SHELTERS