TX SB1224 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use by a property owner of a common or contract carrier to send a payment, report, application, statement, or other document or paper to a taxing unit or taxing official.
Title
Relating to the use by a property owner of a common or contract carrier to send a payment, report, application, statement, or other document or paper to a taxing unit or taxing official.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - SB 1224Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-14 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-09 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Common Carriers
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--Property-State Administration