TX SB1254 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to verification of the citizenship status of certain registered voters.
Title
Relating to verification of the citizenship status of certain registered voters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4540 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Elections
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1254 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01254I.htm |