TX SB1269 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to extending the length of time for which an affidavit establishing probable cause for a search warrant may be sealed.
Title
Relating to extending the length of time for which an affidavit establishing probable cause for a search warrant may be sealed.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3335 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SEARCH WARRANTS
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SEARCH WARRANTS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1269 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01269I.htm |