TX SB1279 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of certain retail electric products.
Title
Relating to the regulation of certain retail electric products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB16 (Similar To) 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB16 (Similar To) 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB16 (Similar To) 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21