TX SB1337 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Van Alstyne Municipal Utility District No. 1 of Grayson County; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Van Alstyne Municipal Utility District No. 1 of Grayson County; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-22 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-22 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2009-05-14 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed | |
2009-03-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2231 (Similar To) 2009-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
VAN ALSTYNE MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
VAN ALSTYNE MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1