TX SB1338 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the State Preservation Board.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the State Preservation Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-27 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-27 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-25 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-25 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-25 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-25 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-24 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-24 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-24 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-24 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-24 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-24 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-24 | Read | |
2011-05-24 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-17 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Passed | |
2011-05-17 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-16 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-16 | Amended | |
2011-05-16 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-10 | Postponed | |
2011-05-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-10 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-14 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-05 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Administration | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed | |
2011-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Governor
Historic Preservation & Museums
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Governor
Historic Preservation & Museums
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS