TX SB1402 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of cemeteries and the administration of perpetual care trust funds.
Title
Relating to the regulation of cemeteries and the administration of perpetual care trust funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2017-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |