TX SB1463 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the availability of financial information of nonprofit corporations for public inspection.
Title
Relating to the availability of financial information of nonprofit corporations for public inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2147 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.