TX SB1467 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disclosure of certain medical information by electronic means.
Title
Relating to the disclosure of certain medical information by electronic means.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1845 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1845 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1845 |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-04-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2643 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to Public Health
HB2643 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to Public Health
HB2643 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to Public Health