TX SB1521 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Summary
Relating to the regulation of boarding home facilities for persons with disabilities or elderly persons and assisted living facilities.
Title
Relating to the regulation of boarding home facilities for persons with disabilities or elderly persons and assisted living facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Eliot Shapleigh [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
Sen. Earl Wentworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-20 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-15 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Amended | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Amended | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-30 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed | |
2009-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Health
Health--General
Housing
Housing--General
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
Health--General
Housing
Housing--General
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF