TX SB1535 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to unclaimed property.
Title
Relating to unclaimed property.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
Property Interests--Personal Property
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
Property Interests--Personal Property
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY