TX SB1615 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Left pending in committee
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the authorization of airport authorities and the issuance of bonds and the exercise of eminent domain by the authorities.
Title
Relating to the authorization of airport authorities and the issuance of bonds and the exercise of eminent domain by the authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-23 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-23 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AIRPORTS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation