TX SB1695 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to penalties for engaging in organized criminal activity.
Title
Relating to penalties for engaging in organized criminal activity.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Aliseda [R] | Rep. Stefani Carter [R] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] |
Rep. Will Hartnett [R] | Sen. Tommy Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2011-05-25 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-05-19 | Read first time | |
2011-05-13 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Amended | |
2011-05-13 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-13 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
ORGANIZED CRIME
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
ORGANIZED CRIME