TX SB1702 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the regulation of health spas.
Title
Relating to the regulation of health spas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & FITNESS FACILITIES
Health--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PUBLIC NOTICE
SECRETARY OF STATE
HEALTH & FITNESS FACILITIES
Health--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PUBLIC NOTICE
SECRETARY OF STATE