TX SB1752 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to confidentiality of certain Class C misdemeanor records related to the conviction of a child.
Title
Relating to confidentiality of certain Class C misdemeanor records related to the conviction of a child.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Christian [R] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] | Rep. Will Hartnett [R] |
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-03 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Open Records
Crimes--Juvenile
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Open Records