TX SB1890 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the temporary suspension of certain signage restrictions during a state of disaster.
Title
Relating to the temporary suspension of certain signage restrictions during a state of disaster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-02 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | |
2009-04-02 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2009-04-02 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-04-01 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
SIGNS
City Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
SIGNS