TX SB1915 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Comal County Water Improvement District No. 3; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Comal County Water Improvement District No. 3; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - SB 1915Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-24 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-22 | House | Amended |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2013-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMAL COUNTY WATER IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 3
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility