TX SB1942 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the classification and operation of mopeds and certain motorcycles.
Title
Relating to the classification and operation of mopeds and certain motorcycles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3171 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1942 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01942I.htm |