TX SB1947 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Summary
Relating to the authority of two or more municipalities to designate a joint tax increment financing reinvestment zone.
Title
Relating to the authority of two or more municipalities to designate a joint tax increment financing reinvestment zone.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-05-27 | Withdrawn from calendar on 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Postponed | |
2009-05-26 | Vote reconsidered | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Failed to pass | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-24 | Amended | |
2009-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3222 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Committee report printed and distributed
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--City
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
City Government--General
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--City
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous