TX SB1951 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to the penalty for theft of a driver's license, commercial driver's license, or personal identification certificate.
Title
Relating to the penalty for theft of a driver's license, commercial driver's license, or personal identification certificate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1282 (Same As) 2009-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses