TX SB2126 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to taking sand, gravel, marl, shell, and mudshell from the San Jacinto River and its tributaries.
Title
Relating to taking sand, gravel, marl, shell, and mudshell from the San Jacinto River and its tributaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT
Mines & Mineral Resources
SAN JACINTO RIVER
SAN JACINTO RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Mines & Mineral Resources
SAN JACINTO RIVER
SAN JACINTO RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous