TX SB2132 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of information to certain women enrolled in the Healthy Texas Women program.
Title
Relating to the provision of information to certain women enrolled in the Healthy Texas Women program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-06 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 1641 |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1641 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Women
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Women