TX SB247 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to discrimination against or burdening certain constitutional rights of an applicant for or holder of a license to practice law in this state.
Title
Relating to discrimination against or burdening certain constitutional rights of an applicant for or holder of a license to practice law in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3940 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Lawyers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
Courts--General
Lawyers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STATE BAR OF TEXAS